Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shaible, Carol Diane, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Miramontes, Raymond Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION, JUDGE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryDomestic Violence - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time48 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order from Dept.: 51 Clerk: Garvin Reporter: 9:47-9:59 Nature of Hearing:Exist ord cont except as mod by this ord. Raymond anthonly Miramontes sty awy fr Carol Diane Shaible 100yds fr residence, wrk, car. Mand firearm relinq 24 hrs after service of this ord. Expire midnight 5/15/06. M/o serve as ord of the crt. dlf 2/24/06 |
|
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
TRO Order to Show Cause ptnr on 12-29-05 djs 05 07726 Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order DV After Hearing Order for DV after hearing. dlf 2/24/06 |
|
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Reissue Temp. Restraining Order DV filed 2-24-06, Temp. Restraing Order & Notice of Hearing filed 12-29-05, Blnk C/C & C/V Order, Blnk Order: No Travel w/Children/Req. for Order/Blnk Desc. of Abuse-Addt'l Pg./Blnk C/C, C/V & Support Req./Blnk Req. for Order: No Travel w/Children/Bnlk Proof of Service (In Person) Blnk Answer to Temorary Restraining Order filed. Served on RAYMOND A MIRAMONTES by Personal Service on 2-1-06. slf 2-6-06 |
|
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
TRO Order to Show Cause ptnr on 12-29-05 djs 05 07726 Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Off calendar Reissued to 2/15/06 830 51 1/24 dr |
|
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Reissuance OSC/TRO Last Hearing Date 1/25/06 2/15/06 830 dept 51 1/24 dr |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona djs 1-3-06 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Req & Ord Free Svc Res Ord Request and Order for Free Service of Restraining Order (DV). djs 1-3-06 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Waiver of Fees Order signed Yes _X__ No ___ djs 1-3-06 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.