Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Di Blasi, Alina, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Di Blasi, Geraldo, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION, JUDGE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time22 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document sent to FCS Order signed and sent to clerk's for copies and filing. 7/18/06 rs |
|
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
FCS Order Signed Family Court Services Order signed by Judge Kalemkarian . Granted Mediator: Teri Roland 7/18/06 rs |
|
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
FCS Order received Family Court Services Order received. Mailed 6/9/06. 20 days from date of mailing-6/29/06. 6/19/06 rs |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
TRO Order to Show Cause ptnr on 12-29-05 djs 05 07718 Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order DV After Hearing Order for DV after hearing. dlf 1/25/06 |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Minute order Temp Judge Minute Order from Dept.: 23 Temporary Judge: Mullen Clerk: Hooper Reporter: 11:08-11:27 Nature of Hearing:Geraldo Di Blasi sty awy fr Alina Di Blasi, Cassandra dob 7/22/03, Angela dob 10/23/95, Jesse dob 7/31/98, Samuel dob 3/17/05 100yds fr residence, wrk, chldrn's schl, vehicle. Mand firearm relinq 24hrs after issuance of this ord. Expire midnight 1/20/2011. Refer fcs for med w/20dy obj period. TEmp c/c c/v pend med prim to pet, Resp no visits. Fa w/be allowed peaceful phone contact w/the chldrn if initiated by the chldrn and phone calls may be recorded by the mthr. M/o serve as ord of the crt. dlf 1/25/06 |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order Custody Date of hearing 1/20/06 Dept 23 Judge Mullen dlf 1/25/06 |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Stip designating temp judge Stipulation designating temporary judge: Mullen. |
|
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Desc. of Abuse, C/C, C/V, C/S Req., Req. for Order, C/C, C/V Order, Temp Res. Order, Req. for Order: No Travel With Children filed. Served on GERALDO DIBLASI by Personal Service on 1-10-06. slf 1-12-06 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion djs 12-30-05 Event: App & Decl for Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.