Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Piccolo, James C, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Piccolo, Stacy A, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Kalemkarian, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKalemkarian, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time27 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment and proof service by mail on 6/6/08 on Stacy A. Piccolo filed. lrs 6/11/08 | |
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment and proof service by mail on 6/6/08 on James C. Piccolo filed. lrs 6/11/08 | |
March 01, 2006 | Docket Event | File forwarded to:Linda Mann for consolidation 3-1-06 slf | |
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order-Relate cases/non-lead Lead Case #05CEFL07588 lmm 4/26/06 |
|
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre to be hrd w/tro jf per petrucelli Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Consolidated after hearing Case Consolidated after Hearing lmm 4/26/06 |
|
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order from Dept.: 51 Clerk: Garvin Reporter: 11:08-11:14 Nature of Hearing:05cefl07689, 05cefl07727 and 05cefl07588 consol. 05cefl07588 is lead case. Pet filed in 05cefl07689 deemed the response in 05cefl07588. dlf 1/30/06 |
|
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of service-summons filed Proof of service of summons on petition, summons and blank Respnse filed showing service on respondent by personal service on 12/30/05. 1/03/06 fn |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Summons Issued Yes _x__ No ___ bzj 122905 Event: Pet Disso Marr w/child-No Fees |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Uniform custody juris Filed declaration under uniform child custody jurisdiction act. bzj 122905 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.