Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Romero, Maria, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Alvarado, Juventino, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION, JUDGE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time102 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case comment Judgment is missing from file. Pet was to come in on 2-8-10 and speak Jerry haist about re-creating the judgment , she never came in so the file is being put back on the shelf. I will continue to look for the judgment. jf 2-18-10 |
|
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense Petnr's Preliminary ms 10/17/06 |
|
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Dissolution _X__ ms 10/17/06 Legal Separation ___ Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso |
|
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg Fld Jgmt disso marr/date marital status ends: 9/21/06 ms 10/17/06 |
|
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. ms 10/17/06 | |
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Sent judgment to FLEX. 071206 |
|
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document sent to File returned to Family Law 4th Floor after Judgment review and retrun. 6/16/06 rs |
|
June 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judge's return letter or note Documents returned: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR COUSTODY AND VISITATION Reason: This stipulation requires that the mandatory forms be attached. Judge: Kalemkarian Date: 6/15/06 rs |
|
June 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Req. to Enter Default sent to Default Desk-Tower. slf 6-13-06 |
|
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request enter default denied Request for entry of default filed. Default not entered as requested for the following reason: Response filed on 3/7/06 Conformed Copies are in our holding basket in the Clerk's office, ready to be picked up. ms 7/5/06 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.