Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bronson, Christy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bronson, Dan, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with David Kalemkarian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Kalemkarian Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions481 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time119 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Historical Documents DMS Conversion Documents |
|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case returned to the warehouse MM 11.21.11 |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Scanned FL Ret Family Law Judgment Date:9.16.08 Scanned Date:5.16.11 MM 11.21.11 |
|
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal of Attorney Name of attorney withdrawing Babette P Fischer, and date 12/17/08. ms 12/17/08 |
|
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order filed Stipulated Addendum to Judgment on Reserved Issues signed by Judge Kalemkarian Copies to runner box 10-27-08 rym |
|
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Archives for microfilming of Judgment on Reserved Issues 10-27-08 rym | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. 10-27-08 rym | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Waiver filed Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure by both parties filed. 10-27-08 rym |
|
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Reserved Issues Judgment on Reserved Issues. 10-27-08 rym |
|
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Appear, Stips & Waivrs-No Fees 10-27-08 rym |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.