Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Rivera, Juan, Rivera, Gail A., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Simpson, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSimpson, Alan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
Category09 Unlimited - Other Collections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time159 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
60-Day Continued OSC
Judge: Conklin, Jonathan |
|
June 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Off calendar for order to show cause scheduled for 7/6/06--dismissed. ng | |
June 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. ng Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons filed Summons on Complaint filed. KEC |
|
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
POS of summons & comp personal Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on defendant on 4-30-2006 . KEC |
|
May 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
OSC re CMC Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 10-MAY-2006 by EDUQUE. |
|
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conf Minutes Order to Show Cause hearing set for 07/06/06 at 9:00 a.m. in Department 98B for David Scott . Failure to appear at the Case Management Conference Failure to serve all defendants within 60 days. exd |
|
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order to show cause filed Order to show cause re: Case Management Conference signed by Judge M W Snauffer filed. exd |
|
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 28-APR-2006 by KMLATT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.