Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Selma Auto Mall, Inc., filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Ash, Russell, Swanson-Fahrney Ford, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSnauffer, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
Category07 Unlimited - Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice |
Time To Trial465 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time180 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
December 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of dismissal filed. (gac) | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Status Conference 4-5 days Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. le Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Off calendar for arbitration status conference scheduled for 12/5/06 . Dismissal filed le | |
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Minute order - Judge Snauffer Clerk: C. Brown Reporter: M. Pish Nature of Hearing: Arbitration Status Conference Continued to 12/5/06 at 3:30 p.m. in Dept 73 for same Parties to select an arbitratio and set an arbitration date no later than 12/5/06 if not, parties to be present to explain why. Courtcall is approved for the 12/5/06 date kl |
|
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Status Conference parkin 225-6700 la Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
September 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Minute order - Judge Snauffer Minute Order from Dept.: 73 Clerk: C. Brown Reporter: Not Reported Nature of Hearing:Arbitration Status Conference Continued to 10/3/06 at 3:30 p.m. dept 73 for Arbitration Status Conference On the Court's motion this matter is continued as indicated above. Ms Escue no longer with law firm-case has been reassigned to Atty Christopher C. Hoffman. Mr. Chielpegian no longer in case - client has been dismissed. le |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.