Je Higgins Lumber Company,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
John W Phillips,
against
Woodsmiths,
Smith, Eric,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Je Higgins Lumber Company v. Woodsmiths
, et al.
Case Events for
Je Higgins Lumber Company v. Woodsmiths
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
January 16, 2008
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
January 16, 2008
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
January 16, 2008
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/17/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
January 16, 2008
Docket Event
Legacy Case Participant Sheet (Conversion Only) disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
January 15, 2008
Docket Event
Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 01/17/2008 08:30:00 AM published .
January 11, 2008
Docket Event
Dismissal entered as requested.
January 11, 2008
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal filed.
January 10, 2008
Docket Event
Case Notes generated .
January 07, 2008
Docket Event
Woodsmiths added as a Defendant effective 03/11/2005 .
January 07, 2008
Docket Event
JE Higgins Lumber Company added as a Plaintiff effective 03/11/2005 .