Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cacv Of Colorado, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Susan A Blush, against Robinson, Robin A., Robinson, Kenneth, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Does 1-10 Dismissed
Date: 2009-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-01-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-04-10T00:00:00Default Judgment by Court Rejected
Date: 2007-12-26T00:00:00Default Court Judgment Rejected
Date: 2008-04-09T00:00:00CMP Packet
Date: 2007-11-06T00:00:00Request for Default Court Judgement - Rejected
Date: 2008-02-08T00:00:00Default Judgment Status Statement filed.
Date: 2009-01-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-03-17T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court Granted
Date: 2009-01-23T00:00:00Default Judgment by Court rejected
Date: 2008-09-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (ccp 1033) filed.
Date: 2008-12-22T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: 2008-10-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney submitted by CACV Of Colorado, LLC rejected on 03/03/2011 .
Date: 2011-03-03T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: 2008-12-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2007-11-05T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: February 29, 2012Writ of Execution submitted by CACV Of Colorado, LLC rejected on 10/14/2011 .
Date: October 14, 2011Writ of Execution (yolo) Issued
Date: July 24, 2012Writ of Execution submitted by CACV Of Colorado, LLC rejected on 06/29/2011 .
Date: June 29, 2011Writ of Execution (Issued (Sacramento)) Issued
Date: July 14, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: March 02, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.