We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sandra Shewry Director Of Health Services ,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
represented by
Mateo Munoz ,
against
Linda E Garcia As Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Elizabeth H Starkweather ,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Filing Date
January 17, 2006
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Plaintiffs
Sandra Shewry Director Of Health Services
Defendants
Linda E Garcia As Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Elizabeth H Starkweather
Case Events for
Sandra Shewry Director Of Health Services v. Linda E Garcia As Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Elizabeth H Starkweather
Date
Type
Description
October 30, 2015
Docket Event
Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Get Document
October 30, 2015
Docket Event
Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Get Document
October 30, 2015
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
October 01, 2015
Docket Event
Application for Renewal of Judgment submitted by Sandra Shewry Director of Health Services rejected on 10/01/2015 .
Get Document
September 15, 2015
Docket Event
Application for Renewal of Judgment submitted by Sandra Shewry Director of Health Services rejected on 09/15/2015 .
Get Document
August 17, 2015
Docket Event
Application for Renewal of Judgment submitted by Sandra Shewry Director of Health Services rejected on 08/17/2015 .
Get Document
August 04, 2011
Docket Event
Abstract of Judgment Issued
Get Document
May 16, 2011
Docket Event
Abstract of Judgment submitted by Sandra Shewry Director of Health Services rejected on 05/16/2011 .
Get Document
January 24, 2011
Docket Event
Abstract of Judgment submitted by Sandra Shewry Director of Health Services rejected on 01/24/2011 .
Get Document
April 15, 2009
Docket Event
Linda E Garcia as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth H Starkweather added as a Defendant effective 04/15/2009 .
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.