We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Wawanesa Ins Co Vs Anthony D James

Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago

Wawanesa Insurance Company, filed a(n) Civil - Limited case represented by Susan M Benson, against James, Anthony D., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Emily E. Vasquez presiding.

Case Details

Filing Date

December 20, 2004

Last Refreshed

March 12, 2022

Filing Location

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Emily E. Vasquez Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Civil - Limited

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Docket Event Order - Other (Stipulation to Pay Judgment in Installments and Order) filed.
Docket Event Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.
Docket Event James, Anthony D Application for Waiver granted in full on 04/06/2012 .
Docket Event Court Fee Waiver - Civil Fee Waiver scheduled for 05/11/2012 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 32 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

Judge: Emily E. Vasquez

Docket Event Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Pay Judgment in Installment) filed.
Docket Event Stipulation and Order submitted by James, Anthony D rejected on 03/14/2012 .
Docket Event Certificate of Facts Re: Unsatisfied Judgment
Docket Event Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Docket Event Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
See all events