We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Richardson, Harry ,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
W Russell Fields ,
against
Monedero, Carmen ,
Linn, Brian Richard ,
represented by
Randel J Quadros ,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
February 09, 2006
Last Refreshed
October 22, 2021
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Other Parties
Baker, Bruce (Arbitrator)
Law Offices Of W. Russell Fields (Lien Claimant)
W Russell Fields (Attorney)
Case Events for
Richardson, Harry v. Monedero, Carmen
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
October 06, 2008
Docket Event
Notice Re Status of Arbitration Proceedings generated .
Get Document
June 26, 2008
Docket Event
Baker, Bruce appointed as Court Appointed Arbitrator .
June 25, 2008
Docket Event
Linn, Brian Richard added as a Defendant effective 04/03/2002 .
June 25, 2008
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department 44 .
June 25, 2008
Docket Event
Monedero, Carmen added as a Defendant effective 04/03/2002 .
June 25, 2008
Docket Event
Richardson, Harry added as a Plaintiff effective 04/03/2002 .
June 25, 2008
Docket Event
Law Offices of W. Russell Fields added as a Lien Claimaint effective 04/03/2002 .
April 30, 2007
Hearing
Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment Heard
March 29, 2007
Hearing
Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference Heard
December 18, 2006
Hearing
Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference Heard
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.