We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Margen, David ,
Macintyre, Patrick ,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Mark F Goudy ,
against
West Cost Relocatables, Inc ,
Trustee'S Assistance Corporation ,
Trustee Assistance Corporation ,
Intergrated Lender Services Inc ,
City National Bank ,
(total of 8)
See All
represented by
Robert B Fien ,
Lawrence J Dreyfuss ,
Richard S Stone ,
Howard D Hall ,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
January 05, 2004
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Defendants
West Cost Relocatables, Inc
Trustee'S Assistance Corporation
Trustee Assistance Corporation
Intergrated Lender Services Inc
Integrated Lender Services
Other Parties
California Himan Development Corporation (Lien Claimant)
Intergrated Lender Services Inc (Cross - Complainant)
Louis F Flores (Attorney)
Realty Advisors Incorporated (Cross - Complainant)
West Cost Relocatables Inc (Cross - Complainant)
Case Events for
Margen, David v. West Cost Relocatables, Inc
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
January 21, 2008
Docket Event
Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
January 18, 2008
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program heard on 01/17/2008 08:30:00 AM .
Get Document
January 18, 2008
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Court dismissal - Delay reduction rules .
January 18, 2008
Docket Event
Legacy Case Participant Sheet (Conversion Only) disposed with disposition of Court dismissal - Delay reduction rules .
January 18, 2008
Docket Event
Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.
January 18, 2008
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Court dismissal - Delay reduction rules .
January 17, 2008
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program Heard
January 15, 2008
Docket Event
Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 01/17/2008 08:30:00 AM published .
Get Document
January 10, 2008
Docket Event
Case Notes generated .
December 21, 2007
Docket Event
Macintyre, Patrick added as a Cross - Defendant effective 11/07/2002 .
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.