Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Everett Even, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by John-Paul Christopher Sauer, against Brandon Headrick, Harsco Corporation Dba Harsco Metals And, represented by Matthew Johnathan Koonce, in the jurisdiction of Pueblo County, CO, . Pueblo County, CO Superior Courts with Larry Charles Schwartz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2019 |
CategoryEmployment Discrimination |
Last RefreshedAugust 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationPueblo County, CO |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Order
Date: March 27, 2020Return of Service
Date: November 08, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: November 22, 2019Motion(Related Document)
Date: November 22, 2019Complaint w/Jury Demand
Date: November 04, 2019Answer
Date: February 06, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 04, 2019Return of Service
Date: November 08, 2019Summons
Date: November 04, 2019Summons
Date: November 04, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: July 29, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: January 09, 2020Order
Date: February 26, 2020Motion(Related Document)
Date: January 09, 2020Entry of Appearance
Date: April 02, 2020Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document)
Date: March 19, 2020ADR Mediation
Date: May 04, 2020Notice of Change of Address
Date: April 27, 2020Order
Date: May 04, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: May 04, 2020Notice
Date: May 05, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: April 16, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: July 29, 2020Notice
Date: February 27, 2020Motion to Withdraw
Date: March 31, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: March 31, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: January 30, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: January 30, 2020Motion
Date: January 30, 2020Motion
Date: November 22, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: January 09, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: December 11, 2019Complaint - Amended(Related Document)
Date: January 09, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: December 11, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: December 16, 2019Motion
Date: December 11, 2019Order(Related Document)
Date: November 22, 2019Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: November 22, 2019Stipulation
Date: July 29, 2020Notice
Date: July 01, 2020Notice of Change of Address
Date: January 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
JTRL Dispo - Dismissed N/A |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Closed N/A |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice - Granted |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice (filed on behalf of counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendants) |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismissed with Prejudice N/A |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement and Stipulation to Stay | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Pre-Trial Readiness Conference and Jury Trial | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
ADR Mediation Order for Mediation or ADR Settlement Conference |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Pretrial Order-Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.