Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
William T Daly, filed a(n) Civil case represented by William T Daly, against Altick Corwin Lpa, Buckley King Lpa, City Of Riverside Ohio, Jane Doe, Jeffrey D Slyman, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County. This case was filed in Montgomery County Superior Courts with Jonathan P. Hein presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2023 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, OH |
|
CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED CIVIL SUMMONS EFILING Sent on: 03/14/2023 16:25:38.75
Date: March 14, 2023COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND FILED BY WILLIAM DALY Receipt: 1390686 Date: 03/14/2023
Date: March 14, 2023CASE INFORMATION SHEET FILED BY WILLIAM DALY
Date: March 14, 2023INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE ON A NEW CASE VIA CLERK FILED BY WILLIAM DALY
Date: March 14, 2023AGREED ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 19, 2023NOTICE: RULE 26 (F) FILED BY DAWN M FRICK
Date: June 05, 2023NOTICE: JURY DEMAND FILED BY WILLIAM T DALY
Date: April 25, 2023MOTION: TO AMEND THE COURT'S FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER FILED BY GABRIELLE F KARL
Date: October 10, 2023NOTICE: APPEARANCE ATTY CHARLES P ROYER FILED BY Charles P. Royer
Date: April 12, 2023NOTICE: APPEARANCE OF PATRICK KASSON AND AUSTIN RICHARDS FILED BY Patrick Kasson
Date: April 13, 2023ORDER: NOTICE OF INTENT TO ADOPT AND ENFORCE PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 16, 2023REQUEST FOR DISQUALIFICATION
Date: October 12, 2023NOTICE: CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY WILLIAM T DALY
Date: June 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | AGREED ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: NOTICE OF INTENT TO ADOPT AND ENFORCE PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Visiting Judge Certificate of Assignment From Ohio Supreme Court HONORABLE JUDGE JONATHAN HEIN | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISQUALIFICATION | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO AMEND THE FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER FILED BY GABRIELLE F KARL | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION: TO AMEND THE COURT'S FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER FILED BY GABRIELLE F KARL | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED BY WILLIAM T DALY | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DEFENDANTS' CITY OF RIVERSIDE, PETER CERTO, JEFFREY SLYMAN, ALTICK & CORWIN CO. LPA AND BUCKLEY KING, LPA NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FILED BY Gabrielle E Karl | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER MARCH 20, 2024, TRIAL APRIL 01, 2024. PLEASE CALL IN ON CONFERENCING LINE ON THE ORDER. | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE: CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY WILLIAM T DALY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.