Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Charmaine Goebel, Kurt Goebel, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Richard L Carr Jr, against Colonial Lane Improvement Association, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County. This case was filed in Montgomery County Superior Courts with Steven K. Dankof presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, OH |
|
NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION OF GARY GOTTSCHLICH FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: April 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE FILED OF GARY GOTTSCHLICH DEPO FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: April 07, 2023REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: June 26, 2023REPLY PLS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: November 08, 2023REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO AMEND COMPLAINT FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: June 06, 2022INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE ON A NEW CASE BY CLERK FILED BY RICHARD CARR
Date: October 14, 2021NOTICE: OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY NICOLE A. MITCHELL
Date: August 15, 2022NOTICE: OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM FILED BY NICOLE A. MITCHELL
Date: March 24, 2023DISCLOSURE OF EXPERTS FILED FOR PLAINTIFF FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: June 17, 2022STIPULATION RE EXTENDING EXPERT REPORT DEADLINE FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: April 08, 2022REQUEST FOR DISQUALIFICATION .
Date: June 14, 2022NOTICE: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FILED BY NICOLE A. MITCHELL
Date: March 24, 2023RESPONSE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY THOMAS P WHELLEY
Date: April 03, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER AUGUST 11, 2022 AT 10:00 A.M. VIA DIAL-IN
Date: July 08, 2022DISCLOSURE OF EXPERTS FILED PLAINTIFF'S FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: November 09, 2022NOTICE: OF DEPOSITION OF KURT GOEBEL FILED BY NICOLE A. MITCHELL
Date: December 22, 2022REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL BRINEGAR FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: April 12, 2023NOTICE: OF DEPOSITION OF CHARMAINE GOEBEL FILED BY NICOLE A. MITCHELL
Date: December 22, 2022Visiting Judge Certificate of Assignment From Ohio Supreme Court .
Date: January 07, 2022ORDER: SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON JANUARY 7, 2022 AT 9:45 AM
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION OF RICK CARR FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: May 15, 2023ORDER: GRANTING DEFENDANT COLONIAL LANE IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION'S MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME
Date: January 27, 2023FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER JURY TRIAL 11/7/22; FINAL PRETRIAL 10/26/22
Date: January 07, 2022PRETRIAL STATEMENT FILED JOINT FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: July 06, 2023AGREED ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT DISCLOSURE, ETC.
Date: February 07, 2022DISCLOSURE OF EXPERTS FILED PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT DISCLOSURE
Date: February 14, 2022ORDER: SETTING MEDIATION WITH JUDGE STEVEN K DANKOF AUGUST 24, 2023 AT 9:00 AM
Date: July 24, 2023MOTION: SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF COLONIAL LANE IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION FILED BY NICOLE A. MITCHELL
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE .
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE: DEFENDANT COLONIAL LANE IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION'S EXPERT DISCLOSURE
Date: March 22, 2022NOTICE: APPEARANCE ATTY THOMAS P WELLEY II FILED BY Thomas P Whelley, II
Date: March 08, 2023ORDER: GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION TO SET DEADLINE FILE REPLY SUPP. MTN IN LIMINE
Date: November 07, 2023REPLY PLAINTIFFS FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: June 02, 2023DECISION GRANTING MOTION FOR JURY VIEW
Date: November 07, 2023MOTION: LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: June 09, 2023NOTICE: OF CONTINUATION OF DEPOSITION OF JAMES BRINEGAR FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: March 16, 2023MOTION: TO REAPPOINT JUDGE WILLIAM WOLFF (JOINT MOTION) FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: June 08, 2022MOTION: IN LIMINE AND OR MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: July 06, 2023CASE INFORMATION SHEET FILED BY RICHARD CARR Result: CPC-CONFERENCE CONDUCTED
Date: October 14, 2021TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE SOLLE
Date: June 15, 2022CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED CIVIL SUMMONS EFILING Sent on: 10/15/2021 08:06:44.27
Date: October 15, 2021MOTION: LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT FILED BY RICHARD L CARR
Date: May 13, 2022ENTRY GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: June 28, 2022CASE INFORMATION SHEET FILED BY RICHARD CARR
Date: October 14, 2021INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE ON A NEW CASE BY CLERK FILED BY RICHARD CARR
Date: October 14, 2021CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED CIVIL SUMMONS EFILING Sent on: 10/15/2021 08:06:44.27
Date: October 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY PLS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS BENCH BRIEF REGARDING TRIAL OF LEGAL AND EQUITABLE CLAIMS FILED BY RICHARD L CARR | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY PLS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY RICHARD L CARR | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION: TO SET DEADLINE FOR PLS' TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS BENCH BRIEF (ONE DAY REQUESTED) FILED BY RICHARD L CARR | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | TRIAL MATERIALS FILED DEFENDANT COLONIAL LANE IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' BENCH BRIEF CONCERNING TRIAL OF LEGAL AND EQUITABLE CLAIMS FILED BY NICOLE A. MITCHELL | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION: TO SET DEADLINE FOR PLS' TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MTN IN LIMINE FILED BY RICHARD L CARR | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION TO SET DEADLINE FILE REPLY SUPP. MTN IN LIMINE | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DECISION GRANTING MOTION FOR JURY VIEW | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION: IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED BY NICOLE A. MITCHELL | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S SUBMITTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY NICOLE A. MITCHELL | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: SETTING MEDIATION WITH JUDGE STEVEN K DANKOF AUGUST 24, 2023 AT 9:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.