Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Kara Madsen v. Avon Products, Inc., Bobby Brown Professional Cosmetics, Inc., Chanel, Inc., Clinique Laboratories Llc, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Individually and as Successor to The Mennen Company, Conopco Inc., Cosmetic …
On November 16, 2021 torts - asbestos case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY. Judge Erin P. Gall presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 16, 2021
Last Refreshed
June 10, 2024
Filing Location
Ulster County, NY
Filing Court House
Supreme
Category
Torts - Asbestos
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Mass Torts
Status
Bankruptcy
Overview
Causes of Action
1. SOUNDING IN NEGLIGENCE FOR FAILURE TO WARN, NEGLIGENT DESIGN AND NEGLIGENT MANUFACTURE
2. SOUNDING IN BREACH OF EXPRESS AND IMPLIED WARRANTIES
3. SOUNDING IN STRICT LIABILITY FOR FAILURE TO WARN, DEFECTIVE DESIGN, AND DEFECTIVE MANUFACTURE
4. AGAINST THE J&J DEFENDANTS SOUNDING IN CONSPIRACY AND COLLECTIVE LIABILITY/CONCERT OF ACTION
5. SOUNDING IN FRAUD
6. FOR VIOLATION OF CONSUMER PROTECTION LAWS
7. FOR FRAUDULENT CONCEALMENT
8. FOR JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion 29)
Date: Apr 18, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 18, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 29)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 29)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 32 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 31 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 29)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 33 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 34 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 29)
Date: Apr 10, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 27 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 28 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 30 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 29 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 26 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 25 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 24 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 22 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 23 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 20 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 21 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion 028) Longo JJ Bulk Sample Testing
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion 028) 1991 Blount
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion 028) Pl Dep
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion 028) Pl Video Dep
Date: Apr 10, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 028)
Date: Apr 10, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: Mar 29, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 29) Blount Amphibole Research (1991)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 29)
Date: Mar 28, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024AFFIDAVIT (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024AFFIDAVIT (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - AA (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 028)
Date: Mar 21, 2024TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: Mar 21, 2024TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: Mar 21, 2024TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: Mar 21, 2024STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Feb 21, 2024ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 27)
Date: Dec 26, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: Dec 22, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Dec 22, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Dec 19, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: Dec 06, 2023ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: Nov 30, 2023COURT NOTICE (Motion 27)
Date: Nov 21, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) (Motion 27)
Date: Nov 17, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 27)
Date: Nov 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 05, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: Oct 05, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: Jul 06, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: Jul 03, 2023ANSWER Corrected
Date: Jul 03, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: Jun 22, 2023SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: Jun 22, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 26)
Date: Jun 15, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Jun 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A.
Date: Jun 15, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 30, 2023NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: May 24, 2023SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: May 24, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 24, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 24, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 26)
Date: May 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A. (Motion 26)
Date: May 05, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: May 04, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion 24)
Date: May 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion 25)
Date: May 03, 2023NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: Apr 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion 25)
Date: Apr 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion 24)
Date: Apr 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 22)
Date: Apr 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 22)
Date: Apr 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 22)
Date: Apr 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 22)
Date: Apr 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 22)
Date: Apr 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 22)
Date: Apr 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 22)
Date: Apr 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion 22)
Date: Apr 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 22) Corrected
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 22) Corrected
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 22) Corrected
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 22) Corrected
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 22) Corrected
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 22) Corrected
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 22) Corrected
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 22) Corrected
Date: Apr 03, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion 22) Corrected
Date: Apr 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 30, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Mar 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 25)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 25)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 25)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 24)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 25)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 24)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 24)
Date: Mar 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 25)
Date: Mar 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 25)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 24)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 24)
Date: Mar 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 24) Corrected
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 23) Corrected
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 22) Carbone report
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 23)
Date: Mar 23, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 22) P dep excerpt
Date: Mar 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 22)
Date: Mar 23, 2023PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: Mar 09, 2023PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: Mar 09, 2023PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: Mar 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion 20) Corrected
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion 20) Corrected
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion 20)
Date: Feb 10, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 021)
Date: Feb 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 63 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 62 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 64 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 53 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 59 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 55 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 57 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 58 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 60 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 54 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 56 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 52 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 48 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 46 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 50 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 51 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 49 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 45 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 47 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 43 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 41 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 66 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion 021)
Date: Jan 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 61 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 65 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 42 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 40 (Motion 19) Dr. Finkelstein affidavit
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 36 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 35 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 34 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 33 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 32 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 31 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 29 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 30 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 28 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 27 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 23 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 25 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 24 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 26 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 22 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 21 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 44 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 20 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 84 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 82 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 81 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 80 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 83 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 78 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 79 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 77 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 76 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 75 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 74 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 73 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 38 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 37 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 39 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 70 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 72 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 71 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 69 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 68 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 67 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 66 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 65 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 64 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 32 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 30 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 31 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 29 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 28 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 25 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 24 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 23 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 27 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 26 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 21 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 20 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 22 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 98 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 19)
Date: Jan 26, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 97 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 96 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 95 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 94 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 93 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 92 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 91 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 90 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 89 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 88 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 86 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 87 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 85 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 63 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 61 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 62 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 53 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 57 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 55 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 60 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 51 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 59 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 52 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 54 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 58 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 56 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 50 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 49 (Motion 20) Dr. Finkelstein affidavit
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 48 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 47 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 46 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 45 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 44 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 43 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 42 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 41 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 38 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 39 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 40 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 37 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 36 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 35 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 34 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 33 (Motion 20)
Date: Jan 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 14)
Date: Jan 20, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion 14)
Date: Jan 20, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 14)
Date: Jan 20, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 14)
Date: Jan 19, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jan 11, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Jan 11, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Jan 11, 2023ANSWER
Date: Dec 22, 2022ANSWER
Date: Dec 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 021) Corrected
Date: Dec 22, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - VV (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - TT (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - UU (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - SS (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - RR (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - QQ (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - PP (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - OO (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - NN (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - MM (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - LL (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - KK (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - JJ (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - GG (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - II (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - FF (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - HH (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - EE (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - DD (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - CC (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - AA (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 021)
Date: Dec 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 41 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 40 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 39 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 38 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 37 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 33 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 34 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 35 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 36 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 32 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 31 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 30 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 29 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 28 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 27 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 26 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 25 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 23 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 22 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 24 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 21 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 20 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 18) Interrogatories
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 18) Plaintiffs Days 1-3 Dep Transcripts
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 18)
Date: Dec 16, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 34 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 33 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 30 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 31 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 32 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 29 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 28 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 27 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 26 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 25 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 24 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 23 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 22 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 21 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 20 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion 19)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion 20)
Date: Dec 16, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: Dec 13, 2022ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: Nov 18, 2022ANSWER
Date: Oct 24, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 017)
Date: Oct 21, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 016)
Date: Oct 21, 2022ANSWER
Date: Oct 17, 2022ANSWER
Date: Oct 13, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: Oct 13, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 017)
Date: Sep 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 017)
Date: Sep 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 017)
Date: Sep 28, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 016)
Date: Sep 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 016)
Date: Sep 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 016)
Date: Sep 28, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 15)
Date: Sep 16, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: Sep 06, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: Aug 30, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: Aug 30, 2022AFFIRMATION (Motion 15)
Date: Aug 30, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 15)
Date: Aug 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 15)
Date: Aug 30, 2022AFFIRMATION (Motion 15)
Date: Aug 30, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 15)
Date: Aug 30, 2022ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: Aug 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Aug 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Aug 23, 2022PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: Aug 23, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Aug 22, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Aug 19, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Aug 19, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Aug 19, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 14)
Date: Aug 19, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 13)
Date: Aug 19, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 12)
Date: Aug 19, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 11)
Date: Aug 19, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 009)
Date: Aug 19, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 10)
Date: Aug 19, 2022ANSWER
Date: Aug 16, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Aug 15, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Aug 15, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: Jul 27, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Jul 26, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jul 26, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 13)
Date: Jul 21, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 12)
Date: Jul 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 13)
Date: Jul 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 12)
Date: Jul 21, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 11)
Date: Jul 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 11)
Date: Jul 21, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 10)
Date: Jul 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 10)
Date: Jul 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 009)
Date: Jul 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 009)
Date: Jul 19, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: Jul 18, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Jul 18, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: Jul 18, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: Jul 18, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: Jul 05, 2022SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: Jul 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 23, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Jun 22, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Jun 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Jun 22, 2022NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: Jun 22, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 008)
Date: Jun 17, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 007)
Date: Jun 17, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Corrected
Date: Jun 17, 2022SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED) Corrected
Date: Jun 17, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion 006)
Date: Jun 06, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 20, 2022PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: May 18, 2022PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: May 18, 2022PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: May 18, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 18, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: May 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 008)
Date: May 16, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 008)
Date: May 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 008)
Date: May 16, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion 007)
Date: May 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 007)
Date: May 16, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 007)
Date: May 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 007)
Date: May 16, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 006)
Date: May 10, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: May 10, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Apr 22, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 005)
Date: Apr 22, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 004)
Date: Apr 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 20, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: Apr 20, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: Apr 20, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: Apr 15, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: Apr 15, 2022PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: Apr 12, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: Apr 12, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: Apr 12, 2022ANSWER
Date: Apr 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: Apr 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 006)
Date: Apr 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 006)
Date: Apr 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 006)
Date: Apr 07, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 005)
Date: Apr 05, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 005)
Date: Apr 05, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: Apr 04, 2022AFFIRMATION (Motion 004)
Date: Apr 04, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Apr 04, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Apr 01, 2022NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Mar 11, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: Feb 24, 2022SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: Feb 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 003)
Date: Feb 22, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion 003)
Date: Feb 22, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 003)
Date: Feb 22, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Feb 17, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Feb 17, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Feb 17, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Feb 17, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: Feb 07, 2022ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: Jan 26, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 003)
Date: Jan 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 003)
Date: Jan 21, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion 002)
Date: Jan 21, 2022AFFIRMATION Corrected
Date: Jan 17, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Jan 14, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Jan 14, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Jan 14, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Jan 14, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Jan 10, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Jan 10, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Jan 10, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Jan 10, 2022ANSWER
Date: Jan 06, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion 1)
Date: Jan 04, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: Jan 03, 2022ANSWER
Date: Jan 03, 2022ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) (Motion 002)
Date: Dec 22, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 001) Corrected
Date: Dec 22, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Dec 22, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001) Corrected
Date: Dec 22, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 22, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: Dec 21, 2021SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: Dec 21, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 20, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: Dec 20, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 20, 2021ANSWER
Date: Dec 20, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: Dec 20, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 20, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: Dec 20, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 20, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 20, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 20, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 16, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 16, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 15, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 14, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 14, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 13, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 13, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 13, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 13, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 13, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 13, 2021ANSWER
Date: Dec 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 08, 2021ANSWER
Date: Dec 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Nov 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Nov 16, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 16, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #29) Johnson & Johnson's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Omnibus Motions In Limine |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #028) Johnson & Johnson's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Summary Judgment |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #29) | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #29) Talc Technology |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 32 (Motion #028) 1977 CTFA minutes |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 31 (Motion #028) 1976 FDA Memo |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #29) FDA Director comments |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 33 (Motion #028) FDA Executive Summary |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 34 (Motion #028) Pooley Dep excerpt |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #29) Plaintiff's Opposition to J&J's MIL |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #028) | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 27 (Motion #028) Hubbard dep in Dalis |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 28 (Motion #028) J4-1 method |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 30 (Motion #028) 1973 CTFA subcommittee |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 29 (Motion #028) 1976 CTFA minutes |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 26 (Motion #028) CDC article |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 25 (Motion #028) 2014 Gordon article |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 24 (Motion #028) 1974 Rohl & Langer article |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 22 (Motion #028) Cralley article |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 23 (Motion #028) 1974 Rohl article |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 20 (Motion #028) Schultz article |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 21 (Motion #028) Pfizer Tech Report |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion #028) Longo below the waist study |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion #028) Mineralogy textbook excerpt |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion #028) Longo J&J Bulk Sample Testing Longo J&J Bulk Sample Testing Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #028) Compton Affirmation |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #028) New Reagent Systems |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #028) 1992 Cyprus Testing |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #028) 1973 Pooley testing specs |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion #028) 1991 Blount 1991 Blount Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #028) Sanchez Dep excerpt |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion #028) 1998 Blount Letter |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #028) 1961 Battelle Letter |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #028) Windsor Talc Evaluation |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #028) 1975 McCrone Testing letter |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #028) 1971 Testing memo |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion #028) Luzenac Technical Report |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #028) 1974 Notes on Colorado School of Mines |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #028) Pl Dep Pl Dep Redacted |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #028) Hopkins Dep excerpt |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #028) Pl Video Dep Pl Video Dep Redacted |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #028) Plaintiff's Opposition to J&J MSJ |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION *Corrected* Affirmation of Thomas P. Kurland Esq. in Support of Defendant Johnson & Johnson's Omnibus Motions In Limine |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L *Corrected* Exhibit L - Amphibole Content of Cosmetic and Pharmaceutical Talcs *Corrected* Exhibit L - Amphibole Content of Cosmetic and Pharmaceutical Talcs Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #29) | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion #29) Trial Transcript |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #29) Langer, Musco |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #29) Inmate Studies |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #29) 2006 Report Prepared by RJ Lee |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #29) Marketing Memo |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #29) Belvedere, Attorney behind a huge talc verdict |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #29) Johnson & Johnson, Announces Discontinuation of Talc |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #29) Girion, Johnson & Johnson Knew for Decades |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #29) Rabin and Hsu, Johnson & Johnson Feared Baby Powder's Possible |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #29) Nicholson certification |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #29) Todd True Email, 1966 Article |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #29) Gordon article |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #29) Blount Amphibole Research (1991) Blount Amphibole Research (1991) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #29) Dominik D. Alexander Expert Report |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #29) Moline Expert Report |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #29) Olson, Hayes, Weirick |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #29) Emory, Malignant Mesothelioma Following Repeated Exposures to Cosmetic Talc |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #29) Moline, Exposure to Cosmetic Talc and Mesothelioma |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #29) Limited Discovery Deposition from November 3, 2023 |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #29) Moline, Mesothelioma Associated with the Use of Cosmetic Talc |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #29) De Bene Esse Deposition Transcripts from March 16, 18, 2022 |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #29) Plaintiff's Complaint, and First through Sixth Amended Complaints |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #29) Deposition Transcripts from January 20-21, 2022 |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #29) J&J's Answer to Plaintiffs Fifth Amended Complaint |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #29) Affirmation of Thomas P. Kurland, Esq. |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #29) Notice of Defendant Johnson & Johnson's Omnibus Motions in Limine |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #028) | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion #028) Court's so-ordered stipulation to adjourn deadlines |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #028) Affidavit of Dr. Dominik D. Alexander, PhD, MSPH |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #028) Affidavit of Dr. Paul A. Nony, PhD, CIH, CSP |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - AA (Motion #028) No Opposition Summary Judgment Motion and Order |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion #028) Multiple published Talc Studies |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion #028) Jiang, Hand-spinning chrysotile exposure |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion #028) Rodelsperger, hospital-based case-control study (2001) |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #028) OSHA Final Rules (Jun. 20, 1986) |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #028) EPA Health Assessment Update (June 1986) |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #028) Ferrante, Pleural Mesothelioma Asbestos Exposure |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #028) Moline Expert Report |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #028) Welch, Mortality Among Sheet Metal Workers (2005) |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #028) Lacourt, Occupational and Non-Occupational Risk of Exposure |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #028) Offermans, Occupational Asbestos Exposure |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #028) Occupational Exposure Studies |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #028) Rolland, Risk of Pleural Mesothelioma Control Study |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #028) Iwatsubo, Pleural Mesothelioma Dose-Response Case-Control Study |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #028) Published Studies and Statistical Updates |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #028) Wild, Cohort mortality and nested case-control study |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #028) Vermont Cohort and US Workers Studies |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #028) Norwegian Cohort Studies |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #028) Italian Cohort Studies |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #028) Note of Issue filed by Plaintiff on May 10, 2022 |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #028) Limited Discovery Deposition from November 3, 2023 |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #028) Deposition Transcripts from March 16, 18, 2022 |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #028) Deposition Transcripts from January 20-21, 2022 |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #028) J&J's Answer to Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #028) Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories and RFPs |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #028) Plaintiff's Complaints and Amended Complaints |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #028) Bankruptcy Decl. 2023 Kim First Day Decl 2023 |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #028) Affirmation of Thomas P. Kurland, Esq. |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #028) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Defendant Johnson & Johnson's CPLR 3101(d) Expert Witness Disclosure |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Defendant Johnson & Johnson's Trial Exhibit List |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Defendant Johnson & Johnson's Fact Witness List |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #27) As to Johnson & Johnson Holdco, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., & Kenvue, Inc. |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL AS TO JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO INC |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED STIPULATION TO ADJOURN SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES, J&J DEFENDANTS |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation to Adjourn Summary Judgment Deadlines |
|
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING Letter Order - Jury Trial |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE (Motion #27) | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) (Motion #27) No Opposition Summary Judgement Motion and Order |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #27) Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Kenvue, Inc.'s Notice of Motion for Order of Dismissal |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) (Proposed) No Opposition Summary Judgment Motion and Order as to defendants Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Kenvue, Inc. |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT ADR Opt In letter. |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Johnson & Johnson HoldCo (NA) Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Kenvue Inc.'s Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to October 3, 2023 |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER *Corrected* J&J's Answer to Fifth Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED) | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #26) AS TO COSMETIC SPECIALTIES INC |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE as to Cosmetic Specialties, Inc. |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A. Filed NOSJM & Order as to Cosmetic Specialties, Inc. |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED) | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #26) NOM for NOSJM as to Cosmetic Specialties, Inc. |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A. (Motion #26) Prop. NOSJM as to Cosmetic Specialties, Inc. |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #24) P&G ltr WD MILs |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #25) Noxell Ltr WD MILs |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #25) Noxell Reply Affirmation |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #24) P&G Reply Affirmation |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #22) EFILED Expert Witness Disclosures |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #22) Madsen Dep Transcripts Excerpts |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #22) Schreiner MIL Opinion Excerpt |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #22) Plaintiff's expert witness disclosure |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #22) Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #22) Moline expert report |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #22) Zhang Expert Report |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #22) Joint Opposition to MILs |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #22) *Corrected* Ex. H to Opposition to MILs |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #22) *Corrected* Ex. G to Opposition to MILs |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #22) *Corrected* Ex. F to Opposition to MILs |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #22) *Corrected* Ex. E to Opposition to MILs |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #22) *Corrected* Ex. D to Opposition to MILs |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #22) *Corrected* Ex. C to Opposition to MILs |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #22) *Corrected* Ex. B to Opposition to MILs |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #22) *Corrected* Ex. A to Opposition to MILS |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #22) *Corrected* Joint Opposition to MILs |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #23) | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #23) Roggli dep excerpt in Morrison |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #23) Viscomi MIL decision |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #23) Diette dep excerpt in Lopez |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #23) Moline dep excerpt in Zimmerman |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #23) Compton prior dep excerpt in Stevenson |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #23) Plaintiff's Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' MILs, mot seq #023 (WCD), #024 & #025 (P&G and Noxell) |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance without Prejudice as to Defendant Presperse Corporation |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #25) Moline Report |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #25) Zhang Report |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #25) Deposition Transcripts |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #24) Deposition Transcripts |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #25) Complaints |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #24) Zhang Report |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #24) Moline Report |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #25) Affirmation in Support of Noxell Omnibus MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #25) Notice of Motion - Noxell MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #24) Complaints |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #23) Ex. V - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #24) Notice of Motion - P&G MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #24) *Corrected* Affirmation in Support of P&G Omnibus MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #23) Ex. W - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #23) Ex. U - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #23) Ex. T - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #23) Ex. Q - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #23) Ex. R - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #23) Ex. S - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #23) Ex. P - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #23) Ex. O - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #23) Ex. N - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #23) Ex. M - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #23) Ex. L - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #23) Ex. K - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #23) Ex. J - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #23) Ex. I - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #23) Ex. F - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #23) Ex. G - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #23) Ex. H - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #23) Ex. E - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #22) Moolgavkar article |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #22) | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #22) Miller MIL Ruling |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #22) Maddalla MIL Ruling |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #22) Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #23) Ex. D - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #22) Desmueles article |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #23) *Corrected* WCD's Letter Brief re MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #22) Carbone report Carbone report Redacted |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #23) Ex. B - WCD MILS |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #23) Ex. C - WCD MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #23) Ex. A - WCD MILS |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #23) Notice of Motion - WCD's MILs |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #23) Aff of C. Kozak, Esq. in Support of WCD MILS |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING AMENDED SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF MIL |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #22) P dep excerpt P dep excerpt Redacted |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #22) | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #22) Kerger article |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #22) Hung article |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #22) Hmeljak article |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #22) Attanoos article |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #22) Helsinki Consensus |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #22) Attanoos preclusion |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #22) Finkelstein Affidavit |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #22) Chirieac article |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #22) Spirtas article |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #22) McGlynn trial ruling |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Defendant WCD Exhibit Disclosure |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Defendant WCD Fact Witness Disclosure |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Defendant WCD Expert Witness Disclosure |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #20) Ex. T - July 12, 2016 a.m. Fitzgerald transcript |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #20) *Corrected* Ex. S - September 21, 2018 Deposition of Steven Compton |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #20) *Corrected* Ex. R - August 17, 2018 Deposition of Steven Compton |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #20) Ex. P - Fitzgerald Trial Test - June 6, 2016, a.m. |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #20) Ex. Q - 2018-10-19 Longo Trial Testimony |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #20) Ex. O - 2016-05-13_ALFARO Trial Castleman CORRECTED depo (COND) |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #20) Ex. N - Expert Witness List |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #20) Ex. M - Olson - Finkelstein Report |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #20) Ex. L - Moline - Aff & Rpt (Olson ROA) |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #20) Ex. K - 2017-09-26 STEVENSON Depo - TALC |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #20) Ex. J - 2018-09-12 ALLEN Depo - TALC - COMPTON |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #20) Ex. I - 2020-11-24 Bell Depo V2 - CP TALC |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #20) Ex. H - Longo (Dep) 2018-10-31 PIPES Longo Depo (cond) |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #20) Ex. E - 2022-03-21 KIRK SMITH Longo dep (cond) |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #20) Ex. G - 2018.09.26 ALLEN Longo Dep. Vol 2 |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #20) Ex. F - 2022.08.23 LUKE Longo Dep Transcript |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #20) Ex. D - 2022.10.13 MCELROY Longo Dep Cond |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #20) Ex. C - 2022-09-09 Longo Deposition (Chapman, CA) |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #20) Ex. B - LTL Management (USBC NJ) - Complaint & Motion re Moline (2022) |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #20) Ex. A - Moline Unsealed Order |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #20) Colgate-Palmolive Company's SJM Reply Memorandum of Law |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #20) Colgate-Palmolive Company's SJM Reply Affirmation |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #021) Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant WCD's Motion for SJ |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #021) St. George dep excerpt in |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #021) | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #021) | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #021) WCD 1995 letter to Avon |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #021) WCD certification exemplar |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #021) Dr. Longo declaration |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #021) 1972 Lewin letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #021) 1976 Coty testing |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #021) Langer testing |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #021) Dec 1974 CTFA meeting |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #021) Plaintiff's Opposition to WCD's MSJ |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #021) 1976 CTFA memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #021) Kolman dep excerpt in Pyle |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 63 (Motion #19) Sanchez testimony in herford |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 62 (Motion #19) Dr. Longo testimony in Ingham |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 64 (Motion #19) Citizen Petition |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 53 (Motion #19) Gordon article |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 59 (Motion #19) Mar 1976 CTFA meeting |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 55 (Motion #19) 1972 Dement report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 57 (Motion #19) Hubbard dep in Dalis |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 58 (Motion #19) J4-1 method |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 60 (Motion #19) mar 1976 FDA memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 54 (Motion #19) CDC article |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 56 (Motion #19) urbach-Ross dep excerpt from Depoian |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 52 (Motion #19) 1986 Citizen Petition response |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 48 (Motion #19) Pfizer tech report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 46 (Motion #19) Mineralogy textbook excerpt |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 50 (Motion #19) 1974 Rohl article |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 51 (Motion #19) 1974 Rohl & Langer article |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 49 (Motion #19) Cralley article |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 45 (Motion #19) Dr. Moline report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 47 (Motion #19) Schultz article |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 43 (Motion #19) Dr. Compton affidavit |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 41 (Motion #19) madsen EWL |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 66 (Motion #19) exchanges re Mennen samples |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #021) Pfizer interrogatory responses excerpt in Schoeniger |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #19) | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 61 (Motion #19) May 1977 CTFA minutes |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 65 (Motion #19) Mirabelli letter to editor |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #19) | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 42 (Motion #19) Bowling Green testing |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 40 (Motion #19) Dr. Finkelstein affidavit Dr. Finkelstein affidavit Redacted |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 36 (Motion #19) Bailey Italian talc affidavit |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 35 (Motion #19) 1984 MSHA |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 34 (Motion #19) Lehman dep in Diaz |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 33 (Motion #19) Lehman dep in Bernard continued |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 32 (Motion #19) Lehman dep excerpt in Bernard |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 31 (Motion #19) 1979 Coty testing |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 29 (Motion #19) Mar 1976 memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 30 (Motion #19) Colgate 1979 testing |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 28 (Motion #19) Rohl study |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 27 (Motion #19) Rubino article |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 23 (Motion #19) 1959 official travel report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 25 (Motion #19) Concentration and separation of tremolite |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 24 (Motion #19) 1973 JM testing memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 26 (Motion #19) Dec 1973 CTFA meeting |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 22 (Motion #19) battelle letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 21 (Motion #19) 1972 Italian talc mine examination |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 44 (Motion #19) Dr. Longo baby magic testing |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 20 (Motion #19) intentionally omitted |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion #19) Sept 1972 letter to Dippold |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion #19) Handwritten memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion #19) italian determinazione |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #19) 1971 McCrone letters |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion #19) June 1972 talc analysis |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion #19) 1971 Colorado School letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion #19) Jan 1968 Battelle letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #19) mar 1960 battelle research |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #19) 1960 Battelle letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 84 (Motion #20) 1983 patent |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 82 (Motion #20) Ward dep in Depoian |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 81 (Motion #20) Hopkins dep in Herford |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 80 (Motion #20) Colgate RFAs in Polakow |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 83 (Motion #20) Urbach-Ross dep in Depoian |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 78 (Motion #20) Colgate prior Cal interrogatories excerpts |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 79 (Motion #20) Scala dep in Polakow |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 77 (Motion #20) CDC article |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 76 (Motion #20) 1986 Citizen petition response |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 75 (Motion #20) 1974 Rohl & Langer article |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 74 (Motion #20) 1974 Rohl article |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 73 (Motion #20) Cralley article |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 38 (Motion #19) Luker Van Stewart 2021 testimony |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 37 (Motion #19) Montana Bureau of Mines |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 39 (Motion #19) Cyprus Mines Montana study |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 70 (Motion #20) mineralogy textbook excerpt |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 72 (Motion #20) Pfizer tech report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 71 (Motion #20) Schultz article |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 69 (Motion #20) Madsen EWL |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 68 (Motion #20) Langer dep in Winkel |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 67 (Motion #20) Cashmere service work request |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 66 (Motion #20) Jan 1976 talc meeting |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 65 (Motion #20) Hopkins dep in Herford |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 64 (Motion #20) newspaper articles |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 32 (Motion #20) June 1972 talc analysis |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 30 (Motion #20) 1971 McCrone letters |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 31 (Motion #20) italian determinazione |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 29 (Motion #20) 1971 Colorado School Letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 28 (Motion #20) handwritten asbestos content |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 25 (Motion #20) Mar 1960 battelle reserach |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 24 (Motion #20) Dec 1959 battelle research |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 23 (Motion #20) Sept 1959 Battelle phase |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 27 (Motion #20) Jan 1968 Battelle letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 26 (Motion #20) 1960 battelle letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion #20) May 1958 Battelle report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion #20) 1957 Battelle report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion #20) 1966 geology survey |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 21 (Motion #20) July 1959 Battelle report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 20 (Motion #20) May Battelle report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 22 (Motion #20) Aug 1959 battelle summary |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #20) 1984 MSHA |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion #20) Dr. Compton affidavit |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #19) Dec 1959 battelle research |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #19) Sept 1959 Battelle phase |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #19) Aug 1958 Battelle summary |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #19) July 1959 Battelle report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #19) May 1958 battelle report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #19) May 1958 Battelle report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #19) 1957 Battelle report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #19) 1966 geology survey |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #19) Pl Video Dep |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 98 (Motion #20) Mirabelli letter response |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #19) Pl Dep |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #19) Plaintiff's Opposition to Mennen (Colgate)'s MSJ |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #20) | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #20) | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 97 (Motion #20) citizen petition response |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 96 (Motion #20) Citizen Petition |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 95 (Motion #20) Sanchez testimony in Herford |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 94 (Motion #20) Dr. Longo testimony in Ingham |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 93 (Motion #20) May 1977 CTFA minutes |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 92 (Motion #20) Mar 1976 FDA memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 91 (Motion #20) Mar 1976 CTFA meeting |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 90 (Motion #20) J4-1 method |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 89 (Motion #20) Hubbard dep in Dalis |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 88 (Motion #20) FDA 2014 letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 86 (Motion #20) FDA Q&A |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 87 (Motion #20) FDA website page |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 85 (Motion #20) 1962 cornstarch memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion #20) Dr. Longo Cashmere study |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion #20) Bailey NC talc affidavit |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #20) Bailey Italian talc affidavit |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #20) Gordon article |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #20) Dr. Moline report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #20) Ferry dep from Bernard |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #20) Colgate prior NJ interrogatories excerpts |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #20) Capdevielle dep from Whitted |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #20) Capdevielle prior testimony excerpt in Winkel |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #20) Colgate RFAs from Cal |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #20) Colgate prior Cal interrogatories excerpts |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #20) Colgate prior NJ interrogatories excerpts |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #20) Pl Video Dep |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #20) Pl Dep |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #20) Plaintiff's Opposition to Colgate's MSJ |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 63 (Motion #20) Mar 1976 Shapiro memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 61 (Motion #20) Aug 1972 talc evaluation |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 62 (Motion #20) Mar 1976 Mt Sinai meeting |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 53 (Motion #20) Jan 1976 memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 57 (Motion #20) Simko dep in Bernard |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 55 (Motion #20) oct 1976 memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 60 (Motion #20) Aug 1972 Lewin letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 51 (Motion #20) Ohlmeyer dep in Bernard |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 59 (Motion #20) Sept 1972 letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 52 (Motion #20) Sept 1971 memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 54 (Motion #20) Mar 1976 memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 58 (Motion #20) 1968 JM testing memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 56 (Motion #20) Nov 1976 Colgate letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 50 (Motion #20) Briscese dep in Bernard |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 49 (Motion #20) Dr. Finkelstein affidavit Dr. Finkelstein affidavit Redacted |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 48 (Motion #20) Lehman dep testimony in Diaz |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 47 (Motion #20) Lehman dep excerpt in Bernard continued |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 46 (Motion #20) Lehman dep excerpt in Bernard |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 45 (Motion #20) 1979 letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 44 (Motion #20) 1979 Colgate testing |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 43 (Motion #20) Mar 1976 memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 42 (Motion #20) Rubino study |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 41 (Motion #20) Rohl study |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 38 (Motion #20) 1973 JM testing memo |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 39 (Motion #20) Concentration and separation of tremolite |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 40 (Motion #20) 1973 CTFA report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 37 (Motion #20) 1959 official travel report |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 36 (Motion #20) battelle letter |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 35 (Motion #20) 1972 italian mine examination |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 34 (Motion #20) intentionally omitted |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 33 (Motion #20) Sept 1972 letter |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #14) Order |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #14) filed on behalf of Kolmar Laboratories, Inc. n/k/a Port Jervis Laboratories, Inc. |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #14) AS TO KOLMAR |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #14) | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Kering Americas, Inc.'s Notice of Entry |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Yves Saint Laurent America Holding Inc., and Yves Saint Laurent America Inc.'s Notice of Entry |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER P&G Answer |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Noxell Answer |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #021) *Corrected* | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #021) | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #021) | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - VV (Motion #021) FDA August 03 1971 Symposium on Talc |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - TT (Motion #021) Donovan v. A.O. Smith Water Products Co. et al. Index 190166-19 (2021) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - UU (Motion #021) McNeal v. WCD |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - SS (Motion #021) Excerpts of Trial Rulings in the Robusto (2015) and Nemeth (2017) trials tried before Justice Martin Shulman |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - RR (Motion #021) Justice Peter Moulton's June 20, 2017 Decision relative to a new NYCAL CMO |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - QQ (Motion #021) Justice Sherry Heitler's April 8, 2014 Decision relative to punitive damages |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - PP (Motion #021) Olson (1st Dept) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - OO (Motion #021) Grunert (1st Dept) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - NN (Motion #021) Dyer (1st Dept) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - MM (Motion #021) Pomponi (1st Dept) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - LL (Motion #021) See In Re New York City Asbestos Litigation (DiScala-Robusto) 173 A.D. 3d 573 (N.Y. 1st Dept. 2019) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - KK (Motion #021) Nemeth v Brenntag N. Am., 2022 NY Slip OP 02769 [2022] |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - JJ (Motion #021) Hanson v. Colgate-Palmolive Co. No. CV 216-034, 2018 WL 4686438 (S.D. Ga. Sept. 28, 2018) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - GG (Motion #021) Lindstrom v. AC Product Liability Trust 424 F.3d 488 498 (6th Cir. 2005) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - II (Motion #021) Berg v. Alta Building Material Co. RG17849298 (Cal. Sup. Ct. March 16 2018) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - FF (Motion #021) Wagner v. Bondex International Inc. 368 S.W.3d 340, 351-52 (Mo. Ct. App. 2012) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - HH (Motion #021) Chapp v. Borg Warner Morse Tec LLC 15 cv 5887 (Wi. Cir. Ct. April 4 2018) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - EE (Motion #021) Collin v. Calportland Co. 228 Cal. App. 4th 582, 586, 592-93, 595-97 (2014) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - DD (Motion #021) Shields v. American Biltrite Inc. et al. Index 2016-3854 [N.Y. Sup. Ct. Cty. Monroe March 30 2017] (unreported) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - CC (Motion #021) IARC World Health Organization International Agency for Research on Cancer The Monographs - Talc (2010) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion #021) U.S. Dept. of Health & Human Services Report on Talc Workshop (February 10 1994) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - AA (Motion #021) World Health Organization International Agency for Research on Cancer The Monographs-Talc 185-224 (1987) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Z (Motion #021) FDA Letter by J.W. Swanson, Acting Associate Commissioner for Regulatory Affairs, FDA (1986) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion #021) U.S. Dept. of Health & Human Services, Qualitative Risk Assessment Committee, Asbestos in Talc (June 6, 1985) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion #021) X - FDA Memorandum by Heinz Eiermann, Director, Div. of Cosmetics Technology, p.2 - Questions Concerning Toxicity of Talc (February 27, 1976) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #021) Pierce Report 12.16.22 (Madsen) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #021) Wild et. al A Cohort Mortality and Nested Case Control Study of French and Austrian Talc Workers, Occup. Environ. Med. 59-98-105 (2002) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #021) Cogglia et. al An Update of a Mortality Study of Talc Miners and Miners in Italy 44 Am. J. Indust. Med. 63 (2003) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #021) Pira et. al Mortality of Talc Miners and Millers from Val Chisone Northern Italy An Updated Cohort Study J. Occup. & Environ |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #021) Rubino et. al Mortality & Morbidity Among Talc Miners and Millers in Italy in Dust and Disease (1979) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #021) Rubino et al. Mortality Studies of Talc Miners and Millers 18 J. Occup. Med. 186 (1976) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #021) EXH. Q - Dr. Jacqueline Moline's sworn deposition testimony, dated October 16, 2014 |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #021) 2022-10-24 - Mundt and Thompson Report - Madsen |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #021) 2022-12-15 - Segrave Report - ( Madsen) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #021) Affirmation of Christopher Kozak in Support of WCD's SJ Motion |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #021) for Summary Judgment |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #021) WCD(NY) Madsen - Shulton sales (F2490077xB8942) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #021) WCD(NY) Madsen - Estee Lauder sales (F2490108xB8942) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #021) WCD(NY) Madsen - Maybelline sales (F2490167xB8942) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #021) WCD(NY) Madsen - Maybelline sales (F2490167xB8942) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #021) WCD(NY) Madsen - Revlon sales (F2490094xB8942) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #021) WCD(NY) Madsen - L'Oreal sales (F2490136xB8942) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #021) WCD(NY) Madsen - Noxell sales (F2490101xB8942) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #021) WCD(NY) Madsen - Mennen sales (F2490071xB8942) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #021) De Bene Esse Deposition Condensed Transcript Excerpts |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #021) Kara Madsen Discovery Deposition Condensed Transcript Excerpts |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #021) 2022-1-14 Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories- Madsen |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #021) 2022-01-03 EFILED Verified Answer - MADSEN |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #021) 2021-11-16 - Summons & Complaint - Madsen |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #021) 2021-12-21 - First Amended Verified Complaint - Madsen |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 41 (Motion #20) Ex. 41- 2016-06-15 - Alfaro - Order Granting Partial Pun Dam |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 40 (Motion #20) Ex. 40 - 2018-01-11 - Stevenson - Order (granting Colgate's MSJ - Punitives) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 39 (Motion #20) Ex. 39 - 2018-05-03 Lyons MSA Order |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 38 (Motion #20) Ex. 38 - 2011-04-11 Ohlmeyer Depo Vol 2 (NYCAL, Bernard) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 37 (Motion #20) Ex. 37 - 2010-10-26 Briscese - NYCAL Deposition (Vol 1) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 33 (Motion #20) Ex. 33 - RMPS QE-CPC00001411-1415 |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 34 (Motion #20) Ex. 34 - 7-31-1973 Weissler Memo to Schaffner FDA |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 35 (Motion #20) Ex. 35 - Yates Memo to Eiermann (1976-01-07) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 36 (Motion #20) Ex. 36 - 2012-01-10 Deposition of Carl Schwartz (condensed) - REDACTED |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 32 (Motion #20) Ex. 32 - 2009-11-10 & 2010-02-23 Marie Capdevielle Depositions |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 31 (Motion #20) Ex. 31 - CPC-BCALTRSCPT00000768 |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 30 (Motion #20) Ex. 30 - MK-CPC-00000358 |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 29 (Motion #20) Ex. 29 - 2011-04-06 Ohlmeyer Depo Vol 1 (NYCAL, Bernard) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 28 (Motion #20) Ex. 28 - Turse Bernard Depo |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 27 (Motion #20) Ex. 27 - 2011-03-18 Salvatore DeSalva Deposition Vol 1 (NYCAL) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 26 (Motion #20) Ex. 26 - 2011-01-21 Joseph Simko Deposition, Vol 6 (NYCAL, Bernard) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 25 (Motion #20) Ex. 25 - 2010-10-05 Marie Capdevielle Deposition Vol 3 (NYCAL Bernard & Tedrick cases) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 23 (Motion #20) Ex. 23 - Black v Brenntag N. Am., 2018 NY Slip Op 31870[U] [Sup Ct, NY County 2018] |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 22 (Motion #20) Ex. 22 - 2015-10-29 - Barlow - Order granting SJ on punitive damages |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 24 (Motion #20) Ex. 24 - Formula Cards |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 21 (Motion #20) Ex. 21 - 1986 Citizen's Petition Response |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 20 (Motion #20) Ex. 20 - MADAR - SJM Order & Decision (filed) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion #20) Ex. 19 - MOline 2014-10-16 Diaz Depo (COND) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion #20) Ex. 18 - Ciocan et al 2021_Mortality miners,millers_N.Italy |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion #20) Ex. 17 - Pira (2017) Mortality of Talc Miners and Miller |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #20) Ex. 16 - Coggiola (2003) - An Update of a Mortality Study |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion #20) Ex. 13 - Dr. Zhang's Deposition (August 30, 2018 |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion #20) Ex. 15 - Rubino (1979) - Mortality and Morbidity Among Talc Miners and Millers in Italy - Copy |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion #20) Ex. 14 - Rubino (1976) - Mortality Study of Talc Miners and Millers - Copy |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #20) Ex. 11 - Dr. Sahmel's Affidavit and Report |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #20) Ex. 12 - Dr. David Weill Affidavit and Report |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #20) Ex. 8 - Discovery Deposition, Vols. 1-3 and De Bene Esse Deposition of Kara Madsen |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #20) Ex. 9 - Note of Issue |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #20) Ex. 10 - Dr. Burke Affidavit (final) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #20) Ex. 7 - Interrogatories |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #20) Ex. 6 - Fourth Amended Complaint |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #20) Ex. 4 - Second Amended Complaint |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #20) Ex. 5 - Third Amended Complaint |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #19) Ex. 6 - Fourth Amended Complaint |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #19) Ex. 4 - Second Amended Complaint |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #19) Ex. 3 - Amended Complaint |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #19) Ex. 1 - Summons, Complaint, and Initial Fact Sheet |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #19) Ex. 2 - Mennen's Answer |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #19) Proposed Order |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #19) Memo of Law |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #19) Statement of Material Facts |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #19) MADSEN - Affirmation (Final) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #19) Notice of Motion |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion #18) 1994.02.10 Report on Talc Workshop |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - X (Motion #18) 1986.07.11 FDA Letter to Douillet |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #18) 1985.06.06 Brown QRAC Memo DHHS Report |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #18) Coggiola M 2003 An Update of a Mortality Study of Talc Miners & Millers in Italy (1) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #18) Pira 2017 (Mortality of Talc Miners and Millers from Val Chisone, Northern Italy) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #18) Wild, P. et al A Cohort Mortality and Nested Case-Control Study of French and Austrian Talc Workers (2002) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #18) Wergeland, Morbidity and Mortality in Talc-exposed Workers (1990) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #18) Rubino, et al., Mortality Studies of Talc Miners and Millers (1976) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #18) Rubino, et al., Mortality & Morbidity Among Talc Miners and Millers in Italy (1979) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #18) Expert Report - Moline 7-28-22 |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #18) Finley, et al. Inhal. Tox. - Cosmetic Talc As A Risk Factor (2017) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #18) Expert Report - Zhang 5-16-22 |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #18) Bailey-Italy Report |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #18) Compton Report |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #18) Tabasko Depo |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #18) Hubbard Depo |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #18) Macchio Depo Excerpts |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #18) Interrogatories Interrogatories Redacted |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #18) Plaintiff's Days 1-3 Dep Transcripts Plaintiff's Days 1-3 Dep Transcripts Redacted |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #18) Pfizer Answer to 4th Amended Complaint |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #18) Coty Answers to 4th Amended Complaint |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #18) Coty Answers |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #18) Fourth Amended Complaint |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #18) Summons and Complaints |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #18) | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #18) Gramling Depo Excerpts |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #18) | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #20) Proposed Order |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #20) Memo of Law |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #20) Statement of Material Facts |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #20) Affirmation |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #20) Notice of Motion |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 34 (Motion #19) Ex. 34 - Ciocan et al 2021_Mortality miners,millers_N.Italy |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 33 (Motion #19) Ex. 33 - Pira (2017) Mortality of Talc Miners and Miller |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 30 (Motion #19) Ex. 30 - Rubino (1976) - Mortality Study of Talc Miners and Millers - Copy |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 31 (Motion #19) Ex. 31 - Rubino (1979) - Mortality and Morbidity Among Talc Miners and Millers in Italy - Copy |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 32 (Motion #19) Ex. 32 - Coggiola (2003) - An Update of a Mortality Study |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 29 (Motion #19) Ex. 29 - Dr. Sanchez's Affidavit and Report |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 28 (Motion #19) Ex. 28 - Dr. Diette Trial Testimony (2018.10.03) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 27 (Motion #19) Ex. 27 - 2015-10-29 - Barlow - Order granting SJ on punitive damages |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 26 (Motion #19) Ex. 26- 2016-06-15 - Alfaro - Order Granting Partial Pun Dam |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 25 (Motion #19) Ex. 25 - 2018-01-11 - Stevenson - Order (granting Colgate's MSJ - Punitives) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 24 (Motion #19) Ex. 24 - 2018-05-03 Lyons MSA Order |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 23 (Motion #19) Ex. 23 - 2018-05-30 Deposition of Vincenti - Vols 1 and 2 Combined (Garcia) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 22 (Motion #19) Ex. 22 - Executive Committee Meeting on March 18, 1976 |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 21 (Motion #19) Ex. 21- Lucy McCrone Letter |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 20 (Motion #19) Ex. 20- 2016-05-13_ALFARO Trial Castleman CORRECTED depo (COND) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion #19) Ex. 19 - Olson (1976) The Geology of Montana Talc Deposits |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion #19) Ex. 17 - EPA (1986) Airborne Asbestos Health Assessment Update |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion #19) Ex. 18 - Pooley (1972) Examination of Italian Mine Samples |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion #19) Ex. 15 - 1986 Citizen's Petition Response |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #19) Ex. 16 - Black v Brenntag N. Am., 2018 NY Slip Op 31870[U] [Sup Ct, NY County 2018] |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion #19) Ex. 13 - MOline 2014-10-16 Diaz Depo (COND) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion #19) Ex. 14 - MADAR - SJM Order & Decision (filed) |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #19) Ex. 11 - Dr. David Weill Affidavit and Report |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #19) Ex. 12 - Dr. Zhang's Deposition (August 30, 2018 |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #19) Ex. 10 - Dr. Sahmel's Affidavit and Report |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #19) Ex. 9 - Note of Issue |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #19) Ex. 8 - Discovery Deposition, Vols. 1-3 and De Bene Esse Deposition of Kara Madsen |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #19) Ex. 5 - Third Amended Complaint |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #19) Ex. 7 - Interrogatories |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #20) Ex. 2 - Colgate's Answer |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #20) Ex. 1 - Summons, Complaint, and Initial Fact Sheet |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #20) Ex. 3 - Amended Complaint |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING Letter Order - Jury Trial |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #017) AS TO KERING |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #016) AS TO YSLA |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER AMENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #017) Proposed Order for execution |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #017) Executed No Opposition Summary Judgment Motion |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #017) Kering America, inc.s Notice of Motion for Order of Dismissal |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #016) Proposed Order |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #016) Executed No Opposition Summary Judgment Motion |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #016) Yves Saint Laurent America Holding Inc., and Yves Saint Laurent America Inc.'s Notice of Motion for Order of Dismissal |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #15) AS TO DONNA KARAN INTERNATIONAL INC |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Kering Americas, Inc.'s Dismissal Request |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Yves Saint Laurent America Holding Inc., and Yves Saint Laurent America Inc., 's Dismissal Request |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #15) Affirmation of Efiling |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #15) Proposed Order |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #15) Exhibit A- Executed Stip |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #15) Affirmation |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #15) Notice of Motion. Donna Karan International Inc.; Donna Karan Company, LLC (The); G-III Apprael Group LTD |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING Letter Order - Jury Trial |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Dr. Burns's Report |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Dr. Burns's CV |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Expert Witness Disclosure of Dr. Amanda Burns on Behalf of Kolmar Laboratories |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry for So Ordered Dismissal as to Defendant Chanel, Inc. | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry on behalf of Unilever United States Inc., Individually and as Successor to Conopco | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry on behalf of Conopco, Inc. | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry on behalf of Avon Products, Inc. | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry on behalf of New Avon LLC | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #14) Federal Register Vol. 51, No. 119 |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #14) Windsor Minerals Income Statement YE 1985 |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #14) of Kolmar Laboratories' Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #14) Sahmel Article |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #14) Affidavit of Robert Edmonds |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #14) Process Specs |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #14) J&J MS June 1987 |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #14) Deposition of James Mittenthal |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #14) Affidavit of Amanda Burns |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #14) Deposition Transcript of Brenda Leek |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #14) Deposition Transcript of Plaintiff |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #14) Kolmar's Verified Answer |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #14) Discovery Deposition Transcript of Plaintiff |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #14) Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #14) Summons & Complaint |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #14) of Kolmar Laboratories' Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #14) on Behalf of Kolmar Laboratories |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #14) for Summary Judgment on Behalf of Kolmar Laboratories |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #13) AS TO UNILEVER UNITED STATES INC. |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #12) AS TO CONOPCO, INC |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #11) AS TO NEW AVON LLC |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #009) AS TO CHANEL, INC |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #10) AS TO AVON PRODUCTS, INC |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Donna Karan International Inc., Donna Karan Company, LLC (The) and GIII- Apparel Group LTD |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Of e-filing Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Donna Karan International Inc., Donna Karan Company, LLC (The) and GIII- Apparel Group LTD |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING EXTENSION OF DEADLINES |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION of e-filing Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Estee Lauder Inc., Clinique Laboratories, LLC and Bobbi Brown Professional Cosmetics Inc |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Estee Lauder Inc., Clinique Laboratories, LLC and Bobbi Brown Professional Cosmetics Inc |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #13) Executed NOSJM as to Unilever |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #12) Executed NOSJM as to Conopco, Inc. |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #13) Notice of Motion for Order of Dismissal as to Unilever |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #12) Notice of Motion for Order of Dismissal as to Conopco, Inc. |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #11) Executed NOSJM as to New Avon LLC |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #11) Notice of Motion for Order of Dismissal as to New Avon LLC |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #10) Executed NOSJM as to Avon Products, Inc. |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #10) Notice of Motion for Order of Dismissal as to Avon Products, Inc. |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #009) Executed NOSJM |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #009) CHANEL, INC. |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: G-III Apparel group LTD Proposed Stip. of Discontinuance |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION of e-filing |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Donna Karan Company, LLC (The) Proposed Stip. of Discontinuance |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Donna Karan International Inc. Proposed Stip. of Discontinuance |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED) | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal of LVMH Perfumes and Cosmetics, Inc. |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal of LVMH Fragrance Brands US LLC |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal of LVMH Perfumes and Cosmetics, Inc. | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal of LVMH Fragrance Brands US LLC | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex A - Revlon, Inc., et al Voluntary Petition |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) Revlon Holdings, Inc. |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #008) | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #007) AS TO LVMH PERFUMES AND COSMETICS INC |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected* | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED) *Corrected* | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #006) Notice of Entry of Order, NYSCEF Doc. No. 94 |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Request for Dismissal on behalf of Chanel, Inc. |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Kolmar Laboratories' Expert Witness List |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Kolmar Laboratories' Exhibit List |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Kolmar Laboratories' Fact Witness List |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: G-III Apparel Group LTD proposed Stip |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Affirmation of E-Filing | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #008) AOS |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #008) Signed No Opposition Summary Judgment Motion and Order - LVMH Fragrance Brands US LLC |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #008) Notice of Motion for No Opposition Summary Judgment Motion and Order - LVMH Fragrance Brands US LLC |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #007) Statement of Authorization |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #007) AOS |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #007) Signed No Opposition Summary Judgment Motion and Order - LVMH Perfume and Cosmetics Inc. |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #007) Notice of Motion for No Opposition Summary Judgment Motion and Order - LVMH Perfume and Cosmetics, INc. |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #006) As to Puig North America, Inc. |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY by Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc. and Sanofi US Corporation |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #005) As to the Perry Defenants |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #004) As to Sanofi US Services Inc |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS LVMH Perfumes and Cosmetics, Inc.s NOSJM |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS LVMH Fragrance Brands US LLCs NOSJM |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Fully Executed NOSJM as to LVMH Perfumes and Cosmetics, Inc. |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Fully Executed NOSJM as to LVMH Fragrance Brands US LLC |
|
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Unilever's Request for Dismissal |
|
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: New Avon LLC's Request for Dismissal |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) WCD's Notice of Intent to Offer Public Records |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Conopco, Inc.'s Request for Dismissal |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Avon Products, Inc.'s Request for Dismissal |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to the Complaint on behalf of Cosmetic Specialties, Inc. | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Proposed No Opposition Summary Judgment Order |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #006) Affirmation in Support of No Opposition Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #006) No Opposition Summary Judgment Motion |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #005) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Defendants Perry Ellis International Inc., Perry Ellis Menswear Inc., and Perry Ellis Menswear LLC |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #005) Discontinuance as to Perry Ellis Defendants |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #004) In support of No Opposition Motion for Summary Judgement on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc. & Sanofi US Corporation |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) by Sanofi US Services Inc. & Sanofi US Corporation |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Defendants Perry Ellis International Inc., Perry Ellis Menswear Inc., and Perry Ellis Menswear LLC |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) on Behalf of Cytec Industries, Inc. |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED) | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) NOSJM - Mary Kay Inc. |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #003) As to Mary Kay Inc. |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION OF E-FILING VERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ESTEE LAUDER INC. TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) VERIFIED ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT ESTEE LAUDER INC. TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION OF E-FILING VERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ESTEE LAUDER INC. TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) VERIFIED ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT ESTEE LAUDER INC. TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING Letter Order - Jury Trial |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) Mary Kay Inc. |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #002) As to Mennen Company |
|
January 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION *Corrected* Verification of Mennen's Answer |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Donna Karan International Inc. Answer to the 1st Amended Complaint |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Affirmation of E-Filing | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Donna Karan Co LLC (The) Answer to the 1st Amended Complaint |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) G-III Apparel Group Answer to the 1st Amended Complaint |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) VERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BOBBI BROWN PROFESSIONAL COSMETICS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION OF E-FILING VERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BOBBI BROWN PROFESSIONAL COSMETICS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION OF E-FILING VERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CLINIQUE LABORATORIES, LLC TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) VERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CLINIQUE LABORATORIES, LLC TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Presperse Corp. - Answer |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1) FOR EXPEDITED PC |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Notice to Preserve and Observe |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Def Verified Answer - Madsen |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) (Motion #002) MENNEN COMPANY (THE)'s Proposed Order for No Opposition Summary Judgment |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) *Corrected* | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) MENNEN COMPANY (THE)'s Notice of Motion for No Opposition Summary Judgment |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001) | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Original Summons & Complaint |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) *Corrected* Medical Affidavit |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) DK International Answer |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Affirmation of E-Filing | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) G-III Apparel Group Answer |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Sanofi US Services Inc. |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION OF E-Filing VERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BOBBI BROWN PROFESSIONAL COSMETICS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) VERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BOBBI BROWN PROFESSIONAL COSMETICS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION of E-FILING VERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CLINIQUE LABORATORIES, LLC TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) VERIFIED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CLINIQUE LABORATORIES, LLC TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) DK Company LLC (The) - Answer |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant Avon Products, Inc.'s Verified Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Mennen's Answer |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant Conopco, Inc.'s Verified Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant YSLA Holdings, Inc's Verified Answer |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) YSLA, Inc.'s Verified Answer |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Kering Americas, Inc.'s Verified Answer |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant Revlon Holdings, Inc.'s Verified Answer |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant Puig USA, Inc.'s Verified Answer With Cross-Claims To The Verified Complaint |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant Puig North America, Inc.s Verified Answer With Cross-Claims To The Verified Complaint |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant Nina Ricci USA, Inc.'s Verified Answer With Cross-Claims To The Verified Complaint |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service re Verified Answer |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER on Behalf of Kolmar Laboratories, Inc. |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A PLAINTIFFS INITIAL FACT SHEET |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |