Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Fireworks Productions, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Lefkowitz, Jared M, against Fireworks Extravaganza, Inc., J&J Computing Inc., John Sagaria, represented by Creadore, Donald E., Kurland, Adam K, Meth, Michael David, Newman, Ashley, Reitter, Brent Matthew, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Robert A presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 02, 2017 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
|
Last RefreshedJune 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions116 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Orange. The plaintiff, Fireworks Productions, Inc., is suing J&J Computing Inc. (d/b/a Fireworks Extravaganza), Fireworks Extravaganza, Inc., and John S...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 01, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 15, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 29, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: July 25, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 18, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 12, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 26, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 01, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 24, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 24, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 26, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 26, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 26, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: July 24, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: July 24, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 29, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: March 25, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 25, 2019STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 06, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 06, 2019AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 06, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 05, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 25, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 27, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 26, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 24, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 13, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 06, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 04, 2019JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: March 25, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 18, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: June 25, 2019ANSWER
Date: June 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 03, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 18, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 29, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 03, 2019NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: May 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 25, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: June 26, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 18, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 12, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 31, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 25, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 31, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 13, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 25, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 24, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 12, 2019INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: June 12, 2023INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: June 01, 2023INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: May 24, 2023AFFIRMATION OF SERVICES FOR ATTORNEY FOR THE CHILD(REN) UCS881
Date: January 31, 2024ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEY FOR THE CHILD(REN) COMPENSATION UCS882 (PROPOSED)
Date: January 31, 2024STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected*
Date: August 10, 2023INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 13, 2023INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: June 12, 2023INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: June 12, 2023INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: June 12, 2023STATEMENT OF NET WORTH
Date: June 12, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 14, 2024NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: April 05, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 06, 2024NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: October 20, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 16, 2017ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 06, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 24, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 07, 2017ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2017NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: October 05, 2017NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 02, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 22, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 15, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 07, 2021ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - .
Date: October 07, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 16, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 15, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 02, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 07, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 07, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: October 05, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 07, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: September 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 23, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 12, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: May 13, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 22, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 26, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 13, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 12, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: May 13, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: February 25, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 31, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 05, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 05, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: February 09, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #12)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #12)
Date: February 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #12)
Date: February 27, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #12)
Date: February 27, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #12)
Date: February 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #12)
Date: February 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #12)
Date: February 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #12)
Date: February 21, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #12)
Date: January 20, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 24, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #11)
Date: January 18, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #11)
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #11)
Date: January 05, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #11)
Date: January 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #11)
Date: January 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #11)
Date: January 05, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #12)
Date: December 21, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #12)
Date: December 21, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #11)
Date: December 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #12)
Date: December 21, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #11)
Date: December 16, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #11)
Date: December 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #11)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #11)
Date: December 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #11)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #11)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #11)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #11)
Date: December 16, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #11)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #11)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #11)
Date: December 16, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: December 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 02, 2021MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 02, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #16)
Date: March 26, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #16)
Date: March 26, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 25, 2024PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: March 25, 2024PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 21, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 21, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: February 02, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 31, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 31, 2024ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: January 31, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: January 12, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: January 03, 2024OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 03, 2024CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: January 04, 2024CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: January 02, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #15)
Date: December 20, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #15)
Date: December 12, 2023NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 02, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 02, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #15)
Date: December 11, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #15)
Date: December 11, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 16, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 26, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 01, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 30, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 05, 2020ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: October 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #13)
Date: May 02, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 17, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #13)
Date: May 19, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 11, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: May 11, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST Â (Motion #13)
Date: May 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #13)
Date: May 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #13)
Date: May 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #13)
Date: May 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #13)
Date: May 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #13)
Date: May 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #13)
Date: May 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #13)
Date: May 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: May 02, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #13)
Date: May 02, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 19, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 17, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 17, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: April 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 17, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 24, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 20, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 20, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 20, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 17, 2024PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2024ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: April 09, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 10, 2024AFFIRMATION OF ENGAGEMENT
Date: April 09, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #16)
Date: April 03, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #16)
Date: March 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #16)
Date: April 03, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #16)
Date: April 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #16)
Date: March 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #16)
Date: March 26, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 15, 2022ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: November 23, 2022ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: November 17, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 01, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 02, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: September 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 04, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #10) *Corrected*
Date: August 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 01, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 31, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 16, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: February 10, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 19, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 16, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 20, 2024 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 20, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE request granted-Letter from Court |
||
May 17, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 10, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 09, 2024 | ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST | ||
April 09, 2024 | AFFIRMATION OF ENGAGEMENT | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Affirmation in Opposition to Proposed Order with Notice of Settlement |
|
April 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #16) Purchase Agreement |
||
April 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #16) Decision |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.