Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
M. W. an infant by her Mother and Natural Guardian, JESSICA WILCOX and JESSICA WILCOX, Individually, v. Syracuse City School District
On June 18, 2019 a torts - other (bullying) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. Judge Rory A Mcmahon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 18, 2019
Last Refreshed
October 11, 2023
Filing Location
Onondaga County, NY
Filing Court House
Onondaga County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Other (bullying)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Status
Appealed
Overview
Causes of Action
2. ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF, JESSICA WILCOX
just on the First Cause of Action; and
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jul 20, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: Jul 20, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Jun 30, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: Jun 29, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: Jun 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Jun 22, 2023DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Jun 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: May 30, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: May 30, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 10, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion 3)
Date: Mar 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 3)
Date: Mar 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 3)
Date: Mar 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 14, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 14, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 2) Plaintiff 50-h transcript Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Mar 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 2) Exhibit B - DASA 1 Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Mar 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 2) Exhibit M - School Notes Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Mar 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 2) Exhibit C DASA 2 Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Mar 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Mar 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 3)
Date: Mar 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 3)
Date: Mar 13, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 3)
Date: Mar 13, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Jan 20, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion 2)
Date: Dec 22, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion 2)
Date: Dec 22, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion 2)
Date: Dec 22, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Nov 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 2) Transcript J. Cecile Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 2) Deposition Exhibits 1-8 Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 2)
Date: Nov 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 2) DASA Complaint Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Nov 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: Nov 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 2) 50H Transcript M.W. Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 2) 50H Transcript J.W. Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 2) Transcript M.W. 2021 Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 2) DASA Complaint Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 2) Transcript S. McIntyre Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: Nov 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 2) M.W. Student Notes Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 2) M.W. Student Notes Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 2) Transcript S. Dowdell Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 2) Transcript J.W. 2021 Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT (Motion 2)
Date: Nov 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 2)
Date: Nov 28, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: Nov 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT (Motion 2)
Date: Nov 28, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Oct 19, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Oct 03, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Sep 27, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: Jul 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Jun 21, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Jun 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Jun 15, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 02, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Apr 28, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: Feb 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Feb 25, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: Oct 06, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 06, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Sep 28, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: Apr 21, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Aug 26, 2020STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Aug 21, 2020RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: Aug 21, 2020ANSWER
Date: Jul 25, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 08, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 01, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jun 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jun 18, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Auth |
||
July 20, 2023 | Notice of Appeal, Informational Statement, Order, Affidavit of Service | ||
June 30, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 29, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 22, 2023 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) With Bill of Costs |
||
June 22, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 08, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 30, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
May 30, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
May 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #2) Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
May 10, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Trial Letter |
||
March 22, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #3) Statement of Authorization |
||
March 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Dr. Becker-Weidman's Resume |
||
March 22, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Opposition |
||
March 14, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Arthur Becker-Weidman, PhD Affidavit and Enclosures |
||
March 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Exhibit E - Screenshot |
||
March 14, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) John F. Doherty, Ed.D. Affidavit and Attachments |
||
March 14, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts with Word Count |
||
March 14, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts with Word Count |
||
March 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Exhibit H - Jason Cecile EBT Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit H - Jason Cecile EBT Transcript Redacted |
||
March 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) Exhibit J - Shirelle Dowdell EBT Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit J - Shirelle Dowdell EBT Transcript Redacted |
||
March 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Plaintiff 50-h transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiff 50-h transcript Redacted |
||
March 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Exhibit B - DASA #1 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit B - DASA #1 Redacted |
||
March 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) Exhibit K - DASA Training Manual |
||
March 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) Exhibit M - School Notes Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit M - School Notes Redacted |
||
March 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Exhibit C DASA #2 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit C DASA #2 Redacted |
||
March 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) Exhibit L - Jimmie Johnson Post |
||
March 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Exhibit F - Jessica Wilcox 50-h transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit F - Jessica Wilcox 50-h transcript Redacted |
||
March 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Exhibit G - Jessica Wilcox EBT Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit G - Jessica Wilcox EBT Transcript Redacted |
||
March 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Exhibit I _ Shelagh McIntyre EBT Transcript |
||
March 14, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2) Statement of Authorization |
||
March 14, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition with Word Count |
||
March 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Exhibit D - Plaintiff M.W. EBT Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit D - Plaintiff M.W. EBT Transcript Redacted |
||
March 13, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
March 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Becker-Weidman Expert Disclosure |
||
March 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Doherty Expert Disclosure |
||
March 13, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts Disclosed |
||
January 20, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 22, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2) Adjournment of Motion |
||
December 22, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2) Statement of Auth |
||
December 22, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Adjournment letter request |
||
November 29, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT motion return date 01/18/23 (in person) |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Transcript J. Cecile Redacted per 22 NYCRR Transcript J. Cecile Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Deposition Exhibits 1-8 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Deposition Exhibits 1-8 Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #2) Notice of Hard Copy - Surveillance Videos |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) DASA Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR DASA Complaint Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 28, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) 50H Transcript M.W. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 50H Transcript M.W. Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Plaintiffs' Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiffs' Bill of Particulars Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) 50H Transcript J.W. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 50H Transcript J.W. Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Transcript M.W. 2021 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Transcript M.W. 2021 Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) DASA Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR DASA Complaint Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Transcript S. McIntyre Redacted per 22 NYCRR Transcript S. McIntyre Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | ||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) M.W. Discipline Record 2017-2018 Redacted per 22 NYCRR M.W. Discipline Record 2017-2018 Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #2) M.W. Student Notes Redacted per 22 NYCRR M.W. Student Notes Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) M.W. Student Notes Redacted per 22 NYCRR M.W. Student Notes Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Transcript S. Dowdell Redacted per 22 NYCRR Transcript S. Dowdell Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Transcript J.W. 2021 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Transcript J.W. 2021 Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Michelle Stauber Affidavit |
||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #2) Notice of Hard Copy - Appendix of Redacted Names |
||
November 28, 2022 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
November 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Craig Heckman Affidavit |
||
October 19, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Trial scheduled 03/06/23, final PT scheduled 02/14/23 |
||
October 03, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT pre-trial conf. scheduled 10/19/22 (Teams) |
||
September 27, 2022 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue, Certificate of Readiness Redacted per 22 NYCRR Note of Issue, Certificate of Readiness Redacted |
||
September 27, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorizing Lauren M. Scharfenberg |
||
July 06, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
June 21, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 17, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 15, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 02, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 28, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 28, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
February 25, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 06, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Notice to Produce |
||
October 06, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 28, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED ADR/PC |
||
April 21, 2021 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stip. and Order for the Production and Exchange of Confidential Info. |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER Bullying |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of service |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE dss letter/green card |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHO - LDL |