Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Opera House Lofts Llc v. New York City Loft Board
A Special Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Lyle E. Frank presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 05, 2024
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
Supreme
Category
Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78
Practice Area
Administrative
Matter Type
Agency Action
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint involves Petitioner OPERA HOUSE LOFTS LLC, the net-lessee of a property in Brooklyn, New York, and Respondent NEW YORK CITY LOFT BOARD, the administrative agency responsible for enforcing the Loft Law. The Landlord initiated a lega…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 26, 2024COURT NOTICE (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 7
Date: Mar 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 8
Date: Mar 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 4
Date: Mar 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 10
Date: Mar 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 6
Date: Mar 27, 2024PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: Mar 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 3
Date: Mar 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 9
Date: Mar 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 5
Date: Mar 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 1
Date: Mar 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 2
Date: Mar 27, 2024NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) (Motion 001)
Date: Mar 27, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Feb 08, 2024NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 31, 2024PETITION
Date: Jan 31, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: Jan 31, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 7
Date: Jan 31, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 2
Date: Jan 31, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 4
Date: Jan 31, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 5
Date: Jan 31, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 6
Date: Jan 31, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 1
Date: Jan 31, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 3
Date: Jan 31, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2024 |
ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) so ordered |
||
April 26, 2024 | COURT NOTICE (Motion #001) | ||
April 18, 2024 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) | ||
April 05, 2024 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) | ||
March 27, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 Proposed Order |
||
March 27, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 February 2024 Meeting minutes |
||
March 27, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 2005 C of O |
||
March 27, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 Excerpts of Loft Board Monthly Meeting minutes |
||
March 27, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Mandamus Predicate Demand |
||
March 27, 2024 | PETITION (AMENDED) | ||
March 27, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Declaratory Judgment |
||
March 27, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 Loft Board Monthly Meeting agendas |
||
March 27, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 LBO 5172 / Report & Recommendation |
||
March 27, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Reconsideration Application |
||
March 27, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Answer to Reconsideration Application |
||
March 27, 2024 | NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) (Motion #001) | ||
March 04, 2024 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) | ||
February 08, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | ||
January 31, 2024 | NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) | ||
January 31, 2024 | PETITION | ||
January 31, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 Loft Board Meetings Agendas (Sept.2023-Jan.2024) |
||
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Answer to Reconsideration Application |
||
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 2005 C of O as corrected |
||
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 LBO 5172 |
||
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Mandamus Predicate Demand |
||
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Reconsideration Application |
||
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Declaratory Judgment |