Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Vox Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Feldman, Yosef Chaim, Klestzick, Yonatan Y., against Keller Haus D B A Luxury Bath Oc, Kurt Keller, represented by Dale, Dominick R., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Denise Sher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 31, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 22, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A EXHIBIT A AGREEMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B Fox v RPP |
||
October 19, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Plaintiff Affidavit |
||
October 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A Novac Entities v Coronam Auto Repair |
||
October 19, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001) Memo in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss |
||
October 19, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss |
||
October 02, 2023 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to adjourn Motion |
||
June 22, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 22, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
June 22, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 22, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.