Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Gitty Harfenes v. Bank Of New York Mellon, F/K/A The Bank Of New York
On July 20, 2015 a real property - other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 20, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 10, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Filing Court House
Erie County Supreme Court
Category
Real Property - Other
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Case Duration
8 months and 15 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Apr 04, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Sep 29, 2015ANSWER
Date: Sep 29, 2015SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jul 20, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaing |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Search - Assignment of Mortgage |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Note & Mortgage |