Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Elizabeth Ocasio v. Boyd Anthony Cole
A Real Property - Partition case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Bronx County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 01, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 16, 2024
Filing Location
Bronx County, NY
Filing Court House
Supreme
Category
Real Property - Partition
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Overview
Causes of Action
1. For Partition and Sale
2. Accounting
TERD CAUSE OF ACTION Unjust Enrichment
Case Complaint Summary
This legal document is a complaint filed by Elizabeth Ocasio against Boyd Anthony Cole in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Bronx County. The complaint seeks an action of partition of real property, specifically a single-family house lo…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 15, 2024ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: Apr 01, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: Feb 01, 2024SUMMONS
Date: Feb 01, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 01, 2024 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
February 01, 2024 | COMPLAINT | ||
February 01, 2024 | SUMMONS |