Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Hollinger, Michael J., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hollinger, Scarlette J., in the jurisdiction of Boone County. This case was filed in Boone County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2019 |
CategoryDn - Domestic Relations Without Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBoone County, IN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence to/from Court Filed | |
January 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance ---- 1/20/2023 : Michael J. Hollinger |
|
January 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance ---- 1/20/2023 : Scarlette J. Hollinger |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Katherine Shelby Engel as counsel for Petitioner |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Appearance Filed Motion to Withdraw Appearance |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
February 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting ---- 2/19/2021 : Katherine Shelby Engel;Scarlette J. Hollinger Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 2/19/2021 : Katherine Shelby Engel;Scarlette J. Hollinger |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Hearing scheduled for 02/23/2021 at 3:30 PM was cancelled. Reason: Waiver of Hearing by Party. |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Petitioner's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Vacate Hearing |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Vacate Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.